US HB5025 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 854.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 854.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Western and Central Pacific Fisheries Convention Implementation Act to limit the imposition of penalties against a person fishing on a United States flag fishing vessel in certain areas of the Pacific Ocean based on a report by an observer on such a vessel.
Title
To amend the Western and Central Pacific Fisheries Convention Implementation Act to limit the imposition of penalties against a person fishing on a United States flag fishing vessel in certain areas of the Pacific Ocean based on a report by an observer on such a vessel.
Sponsors
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 854. |
2018-12-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1104. |
2018-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-11-15 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |