US HB5019 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 594.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 594.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1335 Jefferson Road in Rochester, New York, as the "Specialist Theodore Matthew Glende Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1335 Jefferson Road in Rochester, New York, as the "Specialist Theodore Matthew Glende Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-08 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 594. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-11-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-09-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 0 (Roll no. 482). (text: CR H7253) |
2014-09-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7275-7276) |
2014-09-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-09-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5019. |
2014-09-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7253-7254) |
2014-09-08 | House | Mr. Collins (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1512 (Related) 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-193.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service