US HB5012 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-35)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To improve research and data collection on stillbirths, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SHINE for Autumn Act of 2023 Stillbirth Health Improvement and Education for Autumn Act of 2023

Sponsors

Rep. Young Kim [R-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY]Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Daniel Goldman [D-NY]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Jackson [D-NC]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Wiley Nickel [D-NC]Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO]
Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA]Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO]Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX]
Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS]Rep. Hillary Scholten [D-MI]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC]Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR]Rep. Emilia Sykes [D-OH]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]
Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY]Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Becca Balint [D-VT]
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Celeste Maloy [R-UT]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ]Rep. Timothy Kennedy [D-NY]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0.
2024-06-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-03-12HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
2024-03-12HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-07-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2023-07-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2023-07-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2647 (Same As) 2023-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback