US HB500 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Survivors of Human Trafficking Empowerment Act Establishes the United States Advisory Council on Human Trafficking, which shall provide advice and recommendations to the Senior Policy Operating Group and the President's Task Force to Monitor and Combat Trafficking in Persons. Directs the Council to: (1) meet at least annually to review federal government policy and programs intended to combat human trafficking, (2) formulate assessments and recommendations to ensure that U.S. policy and programming efforts conform to best practices in the field of human trafficking prevention, and (3) meet with the Group at least annually to present the Council's findings and recommendations.
Title
Survivors of Human Trafficking Empowerment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-01-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E129-130) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/500/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr500/BILLS-114hr500ih.pdf |