US HB4985 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stop Corporate Expatriation and Invest in America's Infrastructure Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to revise rules for the taxation of inverted corporations (i.e., U.S. corporations that acquire foreign companies to reincorporate in a foreign jurisdiction with income tax rates lower than the United States) to provide that a foreign corporation that acquires the properties of a U.S. corporation or partnership after May 8, 2014, shall be treated as an inverted corporation and thus subject to U.S. taxation if, after such acquisition: (1) it holds more than 50% of the stock of the new entity (expanded affiliated group), or (2) the management or control of the new entity occurs primarily within the United States and the new entity has significant domestic business activities. Authorizes additional appropriations to the Highway Account and Mass Transit Account in the Highway Trust Fund.
Title
Stop Corporate Expatriation and Invest in America's Infrastructure Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2489 (Related) 2014-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4679 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2360 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3188-31889)
HB5338 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
HB4679 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2360 (Related) 2014-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3188-31889)
HB5338 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Corporate finance and management
Department of the Treasury
Foreign and international corporations
Government trust funds
Income tax rates
Public transit
Roads and highways
Taxation of foreign income
Transportation programs funding
Appropriations
Corporate finance and management
Department of the Treasury
Foreign and international corporations
Government trust funds
Income tax rates
Public transit
Roads and highways
Taxation of foreign income
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4985/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4985/BILLS-113hr4985ih.pdf |