US HB497 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior: (1) to convey to the San Bernardino Valley Water Conservation District in California approximately 327 acres of identified federal land administered by the Bureau of Land Management and any portion of an identified federal parcel necessary to equalize the values of the lands exchanged; and (2) to accept in exchange approximately 310 acres of district land and any portion of an identified nonfederal parcel necessary to equalize the values of the lands exchanged. To the extent an equalization payment is necessary pursuant to the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976, the amount of such payment shall first be made by way of an in-kind transfer as may be necessary to equalize the fair market values of the properties exchanged. If after such in-kind transfer: (1) the value of the federal lands exceeds the value of the nonfederal lands, the district may make a payment equal to the remaining amount to the United States (if the district opts not to make such payment, the exchange shall not proceed); or (2) the value of the nonfederal lands exceeds the value of the federal lands, Interior shall order the exchange to proceed without requiring any additional payment by the United States to the district. The values of the lands to be exchanged shall be determined by independent and qualified appraisers according to nationally recognized appraisal standards. The district shall pay any costs related to such conveyance. (Sec. 4) The land exchange shall be subject to continuing rights of the district to use, maintain, operate, construct, or relocate or expand groundwater recharge facilities on the nonfederal land exchanged to accommodate groundwater recharge of the Bunker Hill Basin to the extent that those activities are not in conflict with any Habitat Conservation Plan or Habitat Management Plan under which such nonfederal land may be held or managed. (Sec. 5) The bill terminates Secretarial Order 241, dated November 11, 1929 (relating to the withdrawal of a portion of the federal land for an unconstructed transmission line) and revokes the withdrawal effected by such order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 424 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-06-27HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2017-06-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-06-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 329). (text: CR H5202-5203)
2017-06-27HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5217-5218)
2017-06-27HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-06-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 497.
2017-06-27HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5202-5204)
2017-06-27HouseMr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-06-02HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 102.
2017-06-02HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-155.
2017-04-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-04-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2017-04-27HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-04-05HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-01-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB357 (Same As) 2017-07-26 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback