US HB496 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the United States Geological Survey (USGS) to establish a program to study the short-term and long-term mechanisms that cause sinkholes, including extreme storm events, prolonged droughts causing shifts in water management practices, aquifer depletion, and other major changes in water use; and develop maps depicting the zones that are at greater risk of forming sinkholes. The USGS must establish a public website that displays such maps and other relevant information critical for use by community planners and emergency managers.
Title
Sinkhole Mapping Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341. |
2020-06-04 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-427. |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Earth sciences
Emergency planning and evacuation
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Natural disasters
Science, technology, communications
Water use and supply
Emergency planning and evacuation
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Natural disasters
Science, technology, communications
Water use and supply