US HB491 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the boundaries of the Cibola National Forest in New Mexico to include the Crest of Montezuma. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to transfer administrative jurisdiction over such land to the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) for inclusion in the Forest. Instructs the Secretary of Agriculture to administer any permit or other land use authorization for such transferred land that is still in effect as of the transfer date in accordance with the terms of such permit or authorization. Permits such Secretary, upon the expiration of such a permit or authorization, to reauthorize the use covered by that permit or authorization under the authorities available to the Secretary on such terms and conditions as considered in the public interest. Allows the Secretary of Agriculture to acquire, with the owner's consent, the private land included within the boundaries of the Forest by this Act. Requires any federally owned lands that have already been or hereafter may be acquired for National Forest System purposes within the Forest's boundaries, as modified by this Act, to be managed as lands acquired under the Act of March 1, 1911, commonly known as the Weeks Act, and according to the other laws and regulations that pertain to the System. Withdraws the Crest of Montezuma from: (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the public land mining laws; and (3) operation of the mineral leasing, geothermal leasing, and mineral materials laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modify the boundaries of Cibola National Forest in the State of New Mexico, to transfer certain Bureau of Land Management land for inclusion in the national forest, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-25SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2012-04-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2012-04-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2049)
2012-04-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 491.
2012-04-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2049-2050)
2012-04-24HouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2012-04-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 302.
2012-04-16HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-435.
2012-02-29HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2012-02-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2012-02-29HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
2012-02-03HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2011-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
2011-01-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback