US HB4902 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating Higher Education Affordability Necessary to Compete Economically Act or the Middle Class CHANCE Act - Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to increase the maximum Federal Pell Grant for award year 2014-2015 and adjust it each subsequent award year to account for changes in the Consumer Price Index. Directs the Secretary of Education to award an additional Pell Grant to an eligible student who: (1) has received a Pell Grant for an award year, and (2) is enrolled in a program of study for one or more additional payment periods during the same award year that are not otherwise covered by the Pell Grant. Limits the total amount of the Pell Grants awarded to such student for the award year to 150% of the maximum Pell Grant for such award year. Raises, from 12 semesters to 15 semesters, the period during which a student may receive Federal Pell Grants.
Title
Creating Higher Education Affordability Necessary to Compete Economically Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2014-06-26 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1080) |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2374 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4902/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4902/BILLS-113hr4902ih.pdf |