US HB49 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Energy Independence and Job Creation Act This bill directs the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to implement a competitive leasing program for the exploration, development, and production of the oil and gas resources on the Coastal Plain, Arctic National Wildlife Refuge (ANWR), Alaska. The bill amends the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act of 1980 to repeal the prohibition against leasing or other development leading to production of oil and gas from ANWR. The bill requires BLM to conduct its first lease sale within 22 months. This bill also prescribes terms and conditions governing Coastal Plain lease sales, including the establishment of environmental protection standards and the prohibition of exporting oil produced under the lease. The bill establishes the ANWR Alternative Energy Trust Fund, into which shall be deposited 50% of the amount of revenues from federal oil and gas leasing and operations authorized under this bill. The fund must be used to provide grants and incentives for certain energy programs, including grants for clean coal power and renewable energy initiatives, and incentives for hydroelectric production.
Title
American Energy Independence and Job Creation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Arctic Ocean
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Judicial review and appeals
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Trade restrictions
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Alternative and renewable resources
Arctic Ocean
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Judicial review and appeals
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Trade restrictions
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/49/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr49/BILLS-115hr49ih.pdf |