US HB4889 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to codify the Trump administration rule on reporting requirements of exempt organizations, and for other purposes.
Title
Don't Weaponize the IRS Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1777 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7485 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8528 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB7485 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8528 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4889/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4889/BILLS-117hr4889ih.pdf |