US HB4887 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
GREAT Act Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2018 This bill requires the Office of Management and Budget, jointly with the executive department that issues the most federal grant awards, to: (1) establish government-wide data standards for information reported by grant recipients, (2) issue guidance directing federal agencies to apply those standards, and (3) require the publication of recipient-reported data collected from all agencies on a single public website.
Title
GREAT Act Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9074-9075) |
2018-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4887. |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9074-9076) |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 738. |
2018-09-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-947. |
2018-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3484 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 641.