US HB4887 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Became Public Law No: 111-159.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Became Public Law No: 111-159.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
TRICARE Affirmation Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide that health care coverage provided by the TRICARE program and the Nonappropriated Fund Health Benefits Program of the Department of Defense (DOD) shall constitute minimal essential health care coverage as required by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
TRICARE Affirmation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL] |
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Gabrielle Giffords [D-AZ] | Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D-TX] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] | Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Ike Skelton [D-MO] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Gene Taylor [D-MS] |
Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Became Public Law No: 111-159. | |
2010-04-26 | Signed by President. | |
2010-04-14 | Presented to President. | |
2010-04-13 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-04-12 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-04-12 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2213) | |
2010-03-22 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2010-03-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-03-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 152). (text: CR H1762-1763) | |
2010-03-20 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1771-1772) | |
2010-03-20 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-03-20 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4887. | |
2010-03-20 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1762-1767) | |
2010-03-20 | Mr. Levin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-03-19 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3148 (Same As) 2010-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Military personnel and dependents
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Health care coverage and access
Military personnel and dependents
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation