US HB4883 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require the disclosure of certain ownership information relating to health care provider and pharmacy ownership, and for other purposes.
Title
Medicare Common Ownership Transparency Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-07-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4822 (Related) 2023-09-29 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-231, Part I.
HB5378 (Related) 2023-12-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5378 (Related) 2023-12-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4883/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4883/BILLS-118hr4883ih.pdf |