US HB4877 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-209. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-209. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3130 Grants Lake Boulevard in Sugar Land, Texas, as the "LCpl Garrett W. Gamble, USMC Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3130 Grants Lake Boulevard in Sugar Land, Texas, as the "LCpl Garrett W. Gamble, USMC Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3130 Grants Lake Boulevard in Sugar Land, Texas, as the "LCpl Garrett W. Gamble, USMC Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-209. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5192-5193) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2925) |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4877. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2925-2926) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Texas
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Texas