US HB4873 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for special immigrant status for Syrian Kurds and other Syrians who partnered with the United States Government in Syria, and for other purposes.
Title
Syrian Partner Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5210 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2936 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2936 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Middle East
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Syria
Terrorism
Visas and passports
Congressional oversight
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Middle East
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Syria
Terrorism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4873/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4873/BILLS-116hr4873ih.pdf |