US HB4846 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-15)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Safety Employer-Employee Cooperation Act This bill requires the Federal Labor Relations Authority to determine whether a state substantially provides public safety officers or employees: the right to form and join a labor organization; recognition by public safety employers of the employees' labor organization, agreement to bargain with the organization, and reduction of any agreements to writing in a contract or memorandum of understanding; the right to bargain over hours, wages, and terms and conditions of employment; and binding interest arbitration to resolve an impasse in collective bargaining negotiations. The bill makes the authority responsible for: (1) determining the appropriateness of units for labor representation; (2) supervising elections; (3) conducting hearings and resolving complaints of unfair labor practices; and (4) protecting the right of employees to form, join, or assist any labor organization, or to refrain from doing so. An employer, public safety officer, or labor organization may not engage in a lockout, sickout, work slowdown, strike, or any other organized job action that will measurably disrupt the delivery of emergency services and is designed to compel an employer, public safety officer, or labor organization to agree to the terms of a proposed contract.
Title
Public Safety Employer-Employee Cooperation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2845 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6238 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3151 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6238 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3151 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal Labor Relations Authority
Federal preemption
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Law enforcement officers
State and local government operations
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal Labor Relations Authority
Federal preemption
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Law enforcement officers
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4846/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4846/BILLS-115hr4846ih.pdf |