US HB484 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic Health Parity for Military Beneficiaries Act - Directs the Secretary of Defense, no later than August 31, 2009, to complete development of a plan to provide chiropractic health care services and benefits, as a permanent part of the TRICARE program (a Department of Defense managed health care program), for covered beneficiaries. Requires plan implementation by January 31, 2010.
Title
Chiropractic Health Parity for Military Beneficiaries Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-06 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Armed forces and national security
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Military personnel and dependents
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Armed forces and national security
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Military personnel and dependents
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/484/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr484/BILLS-111hr484ih.pdf |