US HB4824 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Broadband Permitting Efficiency Act of 2018
Title
Rural Broadband Permitting Efficiency Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-09-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8130-8131) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4824. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8130-8133) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-08-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 679. |
2018-08-03 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2018-08-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-881, Part I. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-06 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-05-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB604 (Related) 2017-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.