US HB4821 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To hold accountable senior officials of the Government of the People's Republic of China who are responsible for, complicit in, or have directly persecuted Christians in China, and for other purposes.
Title
Combating the Persecution of Religious Groups in China Act
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] |
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to section 10 of H. Res. 1396, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1638, as amended; H.R. 3304, as amended; H.R. 4081, as amended; H.R. 4821, as amended; H.R. 6889, as amended; H.R. 6967, as amended; H.R. 8163, as amended; H.R. 8510, as amended; H.R. 8681, as amended; H.R. 8875, as amended; H.R. 8956; S. 1198; and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 5641. |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1396, proceedings on H.R. 4821 are considered vacated. |
2022-09-29 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4821. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8200-8203; text: CR H8200-8201) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-02-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1396 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.