US HB4816 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Toxic Exposure Research and Military Family Support Act of 2014 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to: select a medical center in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to serve as the national center (Center) for the diagnosis, treatment, and research of health conditions of descendants (i.e., a biological child, grandchild, or great-grandchild) of individuals exposed to toxic substances while serving as members of the Armed Forces that are related to that exposure; establish an advisory board to advise the center, to determine which health conditions result from exposure to toxic substances, and to study and evaluate cases of exposure of current and former members of the Armed Forces to toxic substances; and establish an Office of Extramural Research to conduct research on wounds, illnesses, injuries, and other conditions suffered by active members of the Armed Forces resulting from exposure to toxic substances and to assist the Advisory Board in considering claims of exposure to toxic substances. Requires the Center, in coordination with the National Birth Defect Registry, to track and research the genetic link between individuals who are exposed to Agent Orange and the medical conditions of their children. Extends eligibility for medical care and caregiver assistance to descendants of a veteran who was exposed to toxic substances while serving as a member of the Armed Forces if: (1) the descendant has a health condition resulting from exposure to toxic substances and is homebound due to such condition, and (2) the veteran has or had the same health condition. Authorizes the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to declassify documents (other than documents that would materially and immediately threaten national security) related to any known incident in which not less than 100 members of the Armed Forces were exposed to a toxic substance that resulted in at least one case of disability. Directs the VA Secretary, the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), and the DOD Secretary to jointly conduct a national outreach and education campaign directed at members of the Armed Forces, veterans, and their family members to communicate information on incidents of exposure to toxic substances, health conditions resulting form such exposure, and the potential long-term effects of such exposure.
Title
Toxic Exposure Research and Military Family Support Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ed Pastor [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2014-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1602 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5484 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2738 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5484 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2738 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Birth defects
Child health
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Environmental health
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' medical care
Worker safety and health
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Birth defects
Child health
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Environmental health
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' medical care
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4816/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4816/BILLS-113hr4816ih.pdf |