US HB4802 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the Department of State's rewards program to allow rewards for providing information that leads to the identification or location of an entity or individual that knowingly violates U.S. or United Nations sanctions.
Title
To amend the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to authorize rewards under the Department of State's rewards program relating to information regarding individuals or entities engaged in activities in contravention of United States or United Nations sanctions, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5921-5922) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4802. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5921-5922) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |