US HB4793 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pay Our Troops Act of 2018 This bill provides FY2018 appropriations for military pay and allowances during any period in which interim or full-year appropriations for FY2018 are not in effect. In the event of a government shutdown, the bill provides continuing appropriations for pay and allowances of: members of the Armed Forces, including reserve components, who perform active service during the period; members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces who perform inactive-duty training during the period; and civilian personnel or contractors of the Department of Defense (and the Department of Homeland Security in the case of the Coast Guard) that are providing support to members of the Armed Forces. The appropriations provided by this bill are available until the earlier of: (1) the enactment into law of specified appropriations legislation, or (2) January 1, 2019.
Title
Pay Our Troops Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4871 (Related) 2018-01-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB4852 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4852 (Related) 2018-01-19 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Guard and reserves
Public contracts and procurement
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Guard and reserves
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4793/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4793/BILLS-115hr4793ih.pdf |