US HB479 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
North Korea State Sponsor of Terrorism Designation Act of 2017 This bill expresses the sense of Congress that the government of North Korea likely meets the criteria for designation as a state sponsor of terrorism and, if so, should be so designated. The Department of State shall submit to Congress a determination as to whether such government meets the criteria for designation as a state sponsor of terrorism.
Title
North Korea State Sponsor of Terrorism Designation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 210 (Y: 394 N: 1 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-04-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-04-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 1 (Roll no. 210). (text: CR H2611-2612) |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2616-2617) |
2017-04-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-04-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 479. |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2611-2614) |
2017-04-03 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB672 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Aviation and airports
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
North Korea
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
South Korea
Syria
Television and film
Terrorism
Asia
Aviation and airports
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
North Korea
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
South Korea
Syria
Television and film
Terrorism