US HB4768 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

National Strategy for Combating the Financing of Transnational Criminal Organizations Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Treasury, in consultation with various U.S. agencies and departments, to develop a national strategy to combat the financial networks of transnational organized criminals. Treasury must submit to Congress and regularly update the national strategy. (Sec. 3) The national strategy must: identify and assess the most significant transnational organized crime threats; identify the individuals, entities, and networks that financially support or facilitate transnational organized criminals and assess the scope of such support; assess the methods by which transnational organized crime groups launder illicit proceeds; describe the roles of U.S. agencies and departments to combat the financing and financial facilitation of transnational organized crime groups; and review current efforts and proposed changes to combat the financing or financial facilitation of transnational organized crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Strategy for Combating the Financing of Transnational Criminal Organizations Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2018-03-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1395)
2018-03-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4768.
2018-03-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1395-1398)
2018-03-06HouseMr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-02-13HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 415.
2018-02-13HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-553.
2018-01-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 0.
2018-01-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-01-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-01-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2715 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback