US HB4757 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to expand the eligibility for headstones, markers, and medallions furnished by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for deceased individuals who were awarded the Medal of Honor and are buried in private cemeteries. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to furnish at a private cemetery, and upon request, a headstone, marker, or medallion that signifies the status of an eligible veteran who served in the Armed Forces on or after April 6, 1917, as a Medal of Honor recipient. If the VA furnished a headstone, marker, or medallion for a deceased veteran that does not signify his or her status as a Medal of Honor recipient, the VA shall upon request replace that headstone, marker, or medallion with one that signifies the deceased's status as a Medal of Honor recipient. (Sec. 2) The bill authorizes award of the Presidential Memorial Certificate to certain deceased members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces and certain deceased members of the Reserve Officers' Training Corps. (Sec. 3) The VA may pay the cost of transporting a deceased veteran who: died as the result of a service-connected disability, or who died while in receipt of disability compensation, to a national cemetery or a state- or tribal-owned veterans' cemetery in which the deceased veteran is eligible to be buried; or has no next of kin or other person claiming the body to a national cemetery in which the deceased veteran is eligible to be buried. Such payment shall not exceed the cost of transportation to the national cemetery nearest to the veteran's last place of residence in which burial space is available.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to expand the eligibility for headstones, markers, and medallions furnished by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for deceased individuals who were awarded the Medal of Honor and are buried in private cemeteries.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-29 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 589). (text: CR H6336-6337) |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6352-6353) |
2016-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4757. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6336-6337) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 636. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-812. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Monuments and memorials
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Cemeteries and funerals
Monuments and memorials
Veterans' organizations and recognition