US HB4754 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Change Order Transparency for Federal Contractors Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change Order Transparency for Federal Contractors Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
2018-05-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3800)
2018-05-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4754.
2018-05-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3800-3801)
2018-05-08HouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-01-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback