US HB475 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts the boundary of the Arapaho National Forest in Colorado to incorporate approximately 92.95 acres of additional land. The Department of Agriculture shall include all federal land within the boundary in the Bowen Gulch Protection Area.
Title
Arapaho National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
SB59 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB59 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/475/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr475/BILLS-116hr475ih.pdf |