US HB4743 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to work with a consortium, including the National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium, to support efforts to address cybersecurity risks and incidents, including threats or acts of terrorism. Such a consortium must be composed primarily of nonprofit entities, including academic institutions, that develop, update, and deliver cybersecurity training in support of homeland security. DHS may work with such a consortium to assist its national cybersecurity and communications integration center to: provide training to state and local first responders and officials, develop curriculums, and provide technical assistance; conduct cross-sector cybersecurity training and simulation exercises, including for state and local governments, critical infrastructure owners and operators, and private industry; help states and communities develop cybersecurity information sharing programs; and help incorporate cybersecurity risk and incident prevention and response into existing state and local emergency plans and continuity of operations plans. In selecting a consortium, DHS must consider: (1) any prior experience conducting cybersecurity training and exercises for state and local entities, and (2) the geographic diversity of its members to cover different regions across the United States. DHS must conduct outreach to universities and colleges regarding opportunities to support efforts to address cybersecurity risks and incidents. DHS's authority to carry out this bill terminates five years after its enactment.
Title
National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 394 N: 3 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 3 (Roll no. 194). (text: CR H2409) |
2016-05-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2415-2416) |
2016-05-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4743. |
2016-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2409-2411) |
2016-05-16 | House | Mr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 438. |
2016-05-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-565. |
2016-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies Discharged. |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies. |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Terrorism