US HB4741 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission to exempt projects that replace or make improvements to communications facilities following a major disaster or presidentially declared emergency from certain environmental or historic preservation review requirements. Specifically, the bill exempts such projects from any requirement to prepare an environmental assessment or environmental impact statement. Such projects are also exempt from considerations about the effect they will have on any historic property.
Title
Connecting Communities Post Disasters Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2645 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB7373 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7373 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Historic sites and heritage areas
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Historic sites and heritage areas
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4741/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4741/BILLS-116hr4741ih.pdf |