US HB4694 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Employee Retroactive Pay Fairness Act This bill requires federal employees furloughed due to a lapse in appropriations that begins on or about December 22, 2017, to be compensated at their standard rate of compensation for the period of such lapse as soon as practicable after such lapse ends.
Title
Federal Employee Retroactive Pay Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-12-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4827 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB4961 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5391 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB4961 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5391 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Appropriations
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4694/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4694/BILLS-115hr4694ih.pdf |