US HB4684 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Access to Quality Sober Living Act of 2018 This bill requires the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to publish best practices for operating recovery housing, to distribute such publication to the states, and to provide technical assistance to states seeking to adopt such practices. "Recovery housing" means a shared living environment free from alcohol and illegal drug use and centered on peer support and connection to services to promote recovery from substance use disorders.
Title
Ensuring Access to Quality Sober Living Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5036) |
2018-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4684. |
2018-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5036-5038) |
2018-06-12 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-12-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2678 (Related) 2018-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2142)
HB5311 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5311 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.