US HB4673 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 797.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 797.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting Women in the Aviation Workforce Act This bill directs the Federal Aviation Administration to create and facilitate the Women in Aviation Advisory Board to promote organizations and programs that provide education, training, mentorship, outreach, and recruitment of women into the aviation industry.
Title
Promoting Women in the Aviation Workforce Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 797. |
2018-11-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1018. |
2018-04-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2017-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2244 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8071)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Minority employment
Science and engineering education
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Women's education
Women's employment
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Minority employment
Science and engineering education
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Women's education
Women's employment