US HB4663 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Know Your Vets Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Know Your Vets Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2017-12-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2017-12-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback