US HB4656 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fishing and Small Vessel Relief Act This bill extends until December 18, 2020, an exemption from permit requirements of the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act). The exemption allows certain incidental discharges from vessels that are either less than 79 feet in length or a fishing vessel.
Title
Fishing and Small Vessel Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2194 (Same As) 2017-12-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Environmental protection
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Water quality
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4656/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4656/BILLS-115hr4656ih.pdf |