US HB4635 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Mandatory Mediation Act of 2010 - Amends the Helping Families Save Their Homes Act of 2009 to require the mortgagee of certain one- to four-family residences, as a prerequisite to a foreclosure proceeding or a sheriff sale, and at the mortgagee's expense, to conduct a one-time mediation with the affected mortgagor and a housing counseling agency.
Title
Foreclosure Mandatory Mediation Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Mary Kilroy [D-OH] | Rep. Kendrick Meek [D-FL] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Committee Hearings Held. | |
2010-06-10 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to House Financial Services | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2912 (Related) 2009-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4635/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4635/BILLS-111hr4635ih.pdf |