US HB4624 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 125 Kerr Avenue in Rome City, Indiana, as the "SPC Nicholas Scott Hartge Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 125 Kerr Avenue in Rome City, Indiana, as the "SPC Nicholas Scott Hartge Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Buyer [R-IN] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
Rep. Brad Ellsworth [D-IN] | Rep. Baron Hill [D-IN] | Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Mark Souder [R-IN] |
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 396. | |
2010-05-18 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report. | |
2010-05-17 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-03-26 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. | |
2010-03-10 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-09 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-03-09 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1200) | |
2010-03-09 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4624. | |
2010-03-09 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1200-1201) | |
2010-03-09 | Mr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service