US HB4606 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Small Scale LNG Certainty and Access Act This bill amends the Natural Gas Act to state that an application under the Natural Gas Act for the importation or exportation of natural gas that does not exceed 0.14 billion cubic feet per day shall be granted without modification or delay.
Title
Ensuring Small Scale LNG Certainty and Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-06 - House - On agreeing to the Pallone amendment (A001) H.Amdt.962 RC# 389 (Y: 176 N: 227 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-06 - House - On agreeing to the DeGette amendment (A002) H.Amdt.963 RC# 390 (Y: 195 N: 210 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-06 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 391 (Y: 178 N: 231 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-06 - House - On passage RC# 392 (Y: 260 N: 146 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-06 - House - On agreeing to the DeGette amendment (A002) H.Amdt.963 RC# 390 (Y: 195 N: 210 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-06 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 391 (Y: 178 N: 231 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-06 - House - On passage RC# 392 (Y: 260 N: 146 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-09-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-06 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 260 - 146 (Roll no. 392). |
2018-09-06 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 178 - 231 (Roll no. 391). |
2018-09-06 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2018-09-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Watson Coleman motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prevent liquefied natural gas from being transported in pipelines in which the use of eminent domain was utilized for its construction, operation, or maintenance. |
2018-09-06 | House | Mrs. Watson Coleman moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H7898) |
2018-09-06 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2018-09-06 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-09-06 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 4606. |
2018-09-06 | House | H.Amdt.963 On agreeing to the DeGette amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 195 - 210 (Roll no. 390). |
2018-09-06 | House | H.Amdt.962 On agreeing to the Pallone amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 176 - 227 (Roll no. 389). |
2018-09-06 | House | The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration. |
2018-09-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (CR H7896-7900) |
2018-09-06 | House | Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 4606 as unfinished business. |
2018-09-06 | House | On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-09-06 | House | Mr. Olson moved that the committee rise. |
2018-09-06 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the DeGette amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced the noes had prevailed. Ms. DeGette demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2018-09-06 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1049, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the DeGette amendment No. 2. |
2018-09-06 | House | H.Amdt.963 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. DeGette. (consideration: CR H7893-7894, H7897-7898; text: CR H7893) |
2018-09-06 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Pallone amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced the noes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2018-09-06 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1049, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Pallone amendment No. 1. |
2018-09-06 | House | H.Amdt.962 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Pallone. (consideration: CR H7892-7893, H7896-7897; text: CR H7892) |
2018-09-06 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 4606. |
2018-09-06 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Liz Cheney to act as Chairwoman of the Committee. |
2018-09-06 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 1049 and Rule XVIII. |
2018-09-06 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.R. 1635 and H.R. 4606. Also, the resolution provides for a motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills. |
2018-09-06 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1049. (consideration: CR H7887-7894; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H7891) |
2018-09-05 | House | Rule H. Res. 1049 passed House. |
2018-09-04 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1049 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.R. 1635 and H.R. 4606. Also, the resolution provides for a motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills. |
2018-07-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 651. |
2018-07-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-842. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 15. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-12-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1049 (Related) 2018-09-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Energy
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Oil and gas
Trade restrictions
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Oil and gas
Trade restrictions