US HB4606 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-268.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-268.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to issue right-of-way permits for natural gas pipelines (including all appurtenances used in their operation) that, as of March 1, 2012, are within the boundary of Glacier National Park in Montana. Specifies that each such permit shall be: (1) issued as a right-of-way renewal, (2) for a width of not more than 25 feet on either side of the centerline of the pipeline, and (3) subject to any terms and conditions that are determined by the Secretary to be necessary.
Title
To authorize the issuance of right-of-way permits for natural gas pipelines in Glacier National Park, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Rehberg [R-MT] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 286 N: 10 NV: 135 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 286 N: 10 NV: 135 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 286 N: 10 NV: 135 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-268. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8666) |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2012-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 286 - 10 (Roll no. 627). (text: CR H6811) |
2012-12-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6813-6814) |
2012-12-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-12-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4606. |
2012-12-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6811-6812) |
2012-12-17 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451. |
2012-07-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-627. |
2012-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-07-11 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2012-07-11 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2012-06-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2012-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2012-04-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2229 (Same As) 2012-06-27 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-578.
Subjects
Energy
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Montana
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pipelines
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Montana
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pipelines