US HB4600 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster Assistance Recoupment Fairness Act of 2017 This bill requires the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to: (1) waive a debt owed to the United States related to federal assistance provided under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to an individual or household in relation to a major disaster declared by the President between January 1, 2012, and the date of enactment of this bill, unless the debt involves fraud, the intentional presentation of a false claim, or intentional misrepresentation by the debtor or any party having an interest in the claim; and (2) reimburse a debtor for any payments already made on such a debt.
Title
Disaster Assistance Recoupment Fairness Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-12-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-12-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2216 (Same As) 2017-12-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4600/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4600/BILLS-115hr4600ih.pdf |