US HB460 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for the establishment of a standing Health Force and a Resilience Force to respond to public health emergencies and meet public health needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Force, Resilience Force, and Jobs To Fight COVID–19 Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2021-02-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB32 (Same As) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Employment and training programs
Federal-Indian relations
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign labor
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Immigration status and procedures
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority employment
Minority health
Poverty and welfare assistance
State and local government operations
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback