US HB4585 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services, in coordination with the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration, to develop, implement, and evaluate a national media campaign focused on suicide prevention. In addition, the national suicide prevention hotline must be a three-digit, toll-free number.
Title
Campaign to Prevent Suicide Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-21 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4632) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4585. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4631-4633) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 416. |
2020-09-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-516. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Marketing and advertising
Mental health
Emergency communications systems
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Marketing and advertising
Mental health