US HB4571 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Access to Insurance for Retired (FAIR) Heroes Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Access to Insurance for Retired (FAIR) Heroes Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2017-12-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2117 (Same As) 2017-11-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback