US HB4567 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 548.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DHS Overseas Personnel Enhancement Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), by 90 days after the submission of the 3-year strategy for DHS international programs required under the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2017 and every 180 days thereafter, to brief the congressional homeland security committees on DHS personnel with primary duties that take place outside of the United States. The briefing shall include: a detailed summary of each type of personnel position with such duties and how each such position contributes to DHS's counterterrorism mission, information related to how the geographic and regional placement of such positions contributes to such mission, information related to the position-specific training received by such personnel before and during placement at a foreign location, challenges that may impede the communication of counterterrorism information between DHS personnel at foreign locations and DHS entities in the United States, the status of efforts to implement the three-year strategy for DHS international programs, and the status of efforts to implement a plan to enhance the effectiveness of DHS personnel at foreign locations. (Sec. 3) DHS shall submit to the congressional homeland security committees a plan to enhance the effectiveness of DHS personnel at foreign locations, which shall include proposals to: improve efforts of DHS personnel for purposes of providing foreign partner capacity development and furthering DHS's counterterrorism mission; redeploy DHS personnel to respond to changing threats to the United States; enhance collaboration among DHS personnel at foreign locations, other federal personnel at foreign locations, and foreign partners; improve the communication of counterterrorism information between DHS personnel at foreign locations and DHS entities in the United States; and maintain practices to guard against counter-espionage threats associated with DHS personnel. (Sec. 4) The briefing requirement shall terminate four years after the submission of the three-year strategy for DHS international programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS Overseas Personnel Enhancement Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 12 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 548.
2018-07-30SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-308.
2018-06-13SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-01-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-01-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-01-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 12).
2018-01-10HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration; CR H125)
2018-01-09HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-01-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4567.
2018-01-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H34-36; text: CR H34)
2018-01-09HouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-01-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 364.
2018-01-09HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-490.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback