US HB4566 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-98. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-98. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirms that cash contributions made on or after May 31, 2019, for the exclusive benefit of the families of the dead or wounded victims of the mass shooting in Virginia Beach, Virginia on May 31, 2019, shall be treated as tax deductible contributions. The bill also confirms that payments made on or after May 31, 2019, and on or before June 1, 2021, to the spouse or any dependent of the dead or wounded victims of such mass shooting by an tax-exempt organizations shall be treated as related to such organization's tax-exempt purpose and shall not be treated as inuring to the benefit of any private individual, if such payments are made in good faith using a reasonable and objective formula that is consistently applied with respect to such victims.
Title
Virginia Beach Strong Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-98. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6956) |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9365) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4566. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9364-9366) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Sewell (AL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-09-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2592 (Same As) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.