US HB4566 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alleviating Stress Test Burdens to Help Investors Act This bill amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to: (1) eliminate the Federal Reserve Board's authority to conduct stress tests of nonbank financial companies more than once annually, and (2) exempt certain financial companies not primarily regulated by either a federal banking agency or the Federal Housing Finance Agency from requirements to conduct stress tests. The Securities and Exchange Commission and the Commodity Futures Trading Commission may issue separate regulations requiring specified financial companies with more than $10 billion in total consolidated assets to conduct financial-condition analyses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alleviating Stress Test Burdens to Help Investors Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - On passage RC# 119 (Y: 395 N: 19 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2018-03-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-20HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 395 - 19 (Roll no. 119). (text: CR H1712)
2018-03-20HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2018-03-20HouseH.Amdt.537 On agreeing to the Waters, Maxine amendment (A002) as modified Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1717-1718)
2018-03-20HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the order of the House on March 20, 2018, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Maxine Waters amendment No. 1, as modified.
2018-03-20HouseH.Amdt.537 Waters, Maxine amendment (A002) modified by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1717-1718)
2018-03-20HouseH.Amdt.537 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Waters, Maxine.
2018-03-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4566.
2018-03-20HouseThe resolution provides for one hour of debate on each bill. The resolution makes in order only the further amendment to H.R. 4566 printed in the report. No further amendments on either bill are made in order. Section 3 of the resolution makes it in order to consider any resolution reported from the Rules Committee on the day it is reported through the legislative day of March 23, 2018. Section 4 grants suspension authority on the legislative days of March 22, 2018 and March 23, 2018. Section 5 of the resolution amends section 3(a) of H.Res. 5 by striking "the first session of".
2018-03-20HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 787. (consideration: CR H1712-1718)
2018-03-20HouseORDER OF BUSINESS - Ms. Waters of California asked unanimous consent to modify amendment No. 1 printed in House Report 115-613. Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-19HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 787 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each bill. The resolution makes in order only the further amendment to H.R. 4566 printed in the report. No further amendments on either bill are made in order. Section 3 of the resolution makes it in order to consider any resolution reported from the Rules Committee on the day it is reported through the legislative day of March 23, 2018. Section 4 grants suspension authority on the legislative days of March 22, 2018 and March 23, 2018. Section 5 of the resolution amends section 3(a) of H. Res. 5.
2018-03-15HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
2018-03-15HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-601.
2018-01-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 8.
2018-01-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-01-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR787 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB3574 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback