US HB4561 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SAFE TECH Act Security Assessment Feasibility for Equipment Testing and Evaluation of Capabilities for our Homeland Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to develop a program allowing a vendor to obtain performance testing of transportation security screening technology through a third party as an alternative to the TSA's regular testing process. (Sec. 4) The TSA must develop a process for reciprocal recognition of security standards in coordination with the European Civil Aviation Conference. (Sec. 5) The Government Accountability Office must report on the third-party testing program established by this bill.
Title
SAFE TECH Act Security Assessment Feasibility for Equipment Testing and Evaluation of Capabilities for our Homeland Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-01-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H36-37) |
2018-01-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4561. |
2018-01-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H36-38) |
2018-01-09 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-01-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 371. |
2018-01-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-498. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Aviation and airports
Business ethics
Congressional oversight
Europe
Firearms and explosives
Foreign and international corporations
Government studies and investigations
International organizations and cooperation
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Aviation and airports
Business ethics
Congressional oversight
Europe
Firearms and explosives
Foreign and international corporations
Government studies and investigations
International organizations and cooperation
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security