US HB456 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-42-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2015 Makes an individual who is eligible for educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance program eligible for assistance with the fees for applying to institutions of higher education (IHEs). Sets the amount of such assistance payable to an individual at the lesser of: (1) the total application fees charged to the individual by the IHEs, or (2) $750.
Title
Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/456/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr456/BILLS-114hr456ih.pdf |