US HB4548 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 116-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WAGE Act Workplace Action for a Growing Economy Act
Title
WAGE Act Workplace Action for a Growing Economy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2143 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4822 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ethics, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2952 (Related) 2018-05-29 - Held at the desk.
HB6080 (Related) 2018-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB3064 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4822 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ethics, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2952 (Related) 2018-05-29 - Held at the desk.
HB6080 (Related) 2018-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB3064 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
National Labor Relations Board (NLRB)
Wages and earnings
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
National Labor Relations Board (NLRB)
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4548/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4548/BILLS-115hr4548ih.pdf |