US HB4532 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shash Jaa National Monument and Indian Creek National Monument Act This bill withdraws all federal lands and interests within the exterior boundaries of the Bears Ears National Monument in Utah as declared under Presidential Proclamation 9558, dated December 28, 2016, from: entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws; location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws. The bill declares that such proclamation is null and void. The bill establishes the Shash Jaa National Monument (consisting of approximately 142,337 acres) and the Indian Creek National Monument (consisting of approximately 86,447 acres), to be managed by the Shash Jaa Tribal Management and Indian Creek Management Councils, respectively. The previously established Bears Ears Commission shall advise the councils. The councils shall establish resources protection units to help conserve unique and nationally important historic, sacred, cultural, scientific, scenic, archaeological, natural, and educational resources within their respective monument. Such monuments are withdrawn from: entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws. The Department of the Interior and the Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration shall enter into an exchange of federal and state trust lands, at the completion of which the state trust lands shall be added to the Shash Jaa or the Indian Creek National Monument.
Title
Shash Jaa National Monument and Indian Creek National Monument Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-01-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Archaeology and anthropology
Elementary and secondary education
Federal-Indian relations
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Archaeology and anthropology
Elementary and secondary education
Federal-Indian relations
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4532/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4532/BILLS-115hr4532ih.pdf |